Global Patent Index - EP 0807123 A4

EP 0807123 A4 2000-01-12 - GRANULOCYTE COLONY-STIMULATING FACTOR RECEPTOR (G-CSF-R) INTERACTIVE MOLECULES

Title (en)

GRANULOCYTE COLONY-STIMULATING FACTOR RECEPTOR (G-CSF-R) INTERACTIVE MOLECULES

Title (de)

INTERAKTIVE MOLEKÜLE VON GRANULOZYT-KOLONIEN STIMULIERENDEN FAKTOR REZEPTOR (G-CSF-R)

Title (fr)

MOLECULES INTERACTIVES DU RECEPTEUR DU FACTEUR DE STIMULATION DES COLONIES DE GRANULOCYTES

Publication

EP 0807123 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95911668 A

Priority

  • AU PM375194 A
  • US 9501695 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9521867A1] The present invention relates to cytokine receptor interactive molecules and their use in the development of new therapeutic and diagnostic molecules. More particularly, the present invention provides immunoreactive molecules such as antibodies capable of interacting with granulocyte colony stimulating factor receptor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/24; A61K 39/395; A61K 39/44; A61K 49/00; C07K 16/28; C07K 16/46; C07K 17/00; G01N 33/566; G01N 33/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2013.01); C07K 16/2866 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9521864 A1 19950817 - LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al
  • [X] A. SUREDA ET AL.: "Analysis of granulocyte colony stimulating factor receptor expression on human cell lines and murine cells by means of a purified mAb.", TISSUE ANTIGENS, vol. 42, no. 4, 1993, Copenhagen, Denmark, pages 337, XP002122100
  • [X] V. BROUDY ET AL.: "Monoclonal antibody 4B10 (M33) recognizes stem cell factor (SCF), and antibody VIMD2b (M16) recognize the receptor for granulocyte colony stimulating factor (G-CSF).", TISSUE ANTIGENS, vol. 42, no. 4, 1993, Copenhagen, Denmark, pages 331, XP002122101
  • [X] J. LAYTON ET AL.: "The use of monoclonal antibodies and alanine substitution mutants to define the G-CSF receptor-binding site.", LYMPHOKINE AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, vol. 12, no. 5, 1993, New York, NY, USA, pages 327, XP002122102
  • [PX] J. LI ET AL.: "Growth-stimulation and differentiation-promotion mediated by granulocyte colony-stimulating factor receptor in different hematopoietic cell lines.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 35, March 1994 (1994-03-01), USA, pages 565, XP002122103
  • See also references of WO 9521867A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9521867 A1 19950817; AU PM375194 D0 19940303; CA 2182493 A1 19950817; EP 0807123 A1 19971119; EP 0807123 A4 20000112; EP 1156063 A1 20011121

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010821

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960905

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE