Global Patent Index - EP 0807205 B1

EP 0807205 B1 2000-02-16 - VALVE DRIVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

VALVE DRIVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VENTILTRIEB EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT DES SOUPAPES D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0807205 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95940952 A

Priority

  • DE 9501782 W
  • DE 19502834 A
  • DE 19528756 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9623962A1] A valve drive of an internal combustion engine has a driving shaft (120) with an axis of rotation (D), a rotary body (110) driven by the shaft (120) and an intermediate member (140) whose axis is offset to the rotary body (110) and/or the shaft (120). The intermediate member (140) is linked to the shaft (120) by a first slideway and a first transmission element (100, 200) and/or is linked to the rotary body (110) by a second slideway and a second transmission element (100, 200) and is driven by the shaft (120) and/or the rotary body (110). At least one transmission element (100, 200) has an axial pin (100, 200) with a shaft (101, 201) parallel to the axis of rotation (D). The axial pin (100, 200) has a sliding lug (102, 202) that extends at least on one side over the circumference of the shaft (101, 201) along the slideway and that is secured to the shaft (101, 202) so as to rotate therewith. The sliding lug (101, 202) is preferably made of the same material as the shaft (101, 201).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/356; F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F01L 1/356 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34413 (2013.01); F01L 1/356 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

GB 1311562 A 19730328 - ASS ENG LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9623962 A1 19960808; AU 4252396 A 19960821; EP 0807205 A1 19971119; EP 0807205 B1 20000216

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507827 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-02-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000216

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT