Global Patent Index - EP 0807206 B1

EP 0807206 B1 2000-03-29 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0807206 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900280 A

Priority

  • DE 9600056 W
  • DE 19502834 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19502834A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine in which the rotation speed of a cam can be cyclically changed for gas exchange control, with a camshaft, a cam rotatably fitted on the camshaft, an intermediate member (4) which can be moved in a plane perpendicular to the camshaft and can rotate in any position within said plane and has a first and a second slide guide, a first transmission component connecting the camshaft to the first slide guide to transmit the rotary movement of the camshaft to the intermediate member (4) and a second transmission component which connects the cam to the second slide guide to transmit the rotary movement of the intermediate member (4) to the cam, so that, in one rotation of the camshaft, the cam is cyclically rotated in relation thereto if the axis of rotation of the intermediate member (4) is shifted in relation to that of the camshaft, and also comprises an inner eccentric (30) fitted to rotate on the camshaft and an outer eccentric (40) fitted to rotate on the inner eccentric (30), the intermediate member (4) being fitted to rotate on the outer eccentric (40) and two outer eccentrics (40A, 40B) being fitted on an inner eccentric (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/356; F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F01L 1/356 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34413 (2013.01); F01L 1/356 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19502834 A1 19960808; AU 4384896 A 19960821; EP 0807206 A1 19971119; EP 0807206 B1 20000329; WO 9623964 A1 19960808

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2005-07-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604840 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990423

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT