Global Patent Index - EP 0807212 B1

EP 0807212 B1 2001-04-11 - DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A HYDROSTATIC DRIVE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A HYDROSTATIC DRIVE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES HYDROSTATISCHEN ANTRIEBES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ACTIONNER UNE COMMANDE HYDROSTATIQUE

Publication

EP 0807212 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96901186 A

Priority

  • AT 9600015 W
  • AT 16995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9623980A2] The description relates to a device for actuating a hydrostatic drive (1) with a periodically operable on-off valve (2) which connects a resonant pipe (4) connected to the hydrostatic drive (1) to generate standing pressure waves in the hydraulic medium alternately to a pressure supply line (5) and a return line (6). In order to create favourable control conditions it is proposed that the resonant pipe (4) have a pressure outlet (7) at an oscillation node of the standing pressure waves and the switching times of the on-off valve (2) be controllable at a constant switching frequency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/20 (2006.01); F15B 21/04 (2006.01); F15B 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/20 (2013.01); F15B 21/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9623980 A2 19960808; WO 9623980 A3 19960926; AT 200559 T 20010415; AT 403219 B 19971229; AT A16995 A 19970415; CZ 283346 B6 19980318; CZ 9702285 A3 19971112; DE 59606770 D1 20010517; EP 0807212 A2 19971119; EP 0807212 B1 20010411; US 5974800 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606770

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2002-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606770 20010517

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200559 T 20010415

1998-06-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN REXROTH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971124

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970719

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT