Global Patent Index - EP 0807238 B1

EP 0807238 B1 2001-01-10 - ROTARY REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A ROTARY REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

ROTARY REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A ROTARY REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

UMLAUFENDER REGENERATIVER WÄRMETAUSCHER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES UMLAUFENDEN REGENERATIVEN WÄRMETAUSCHERS

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE ROTATIF A REGENERATION ET PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UN ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE ROTATIF A REGENERATION

Publication

EP 0807238 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96903292 A

Priority

  • SE 9600157 W
  • SE 9500477 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9624813A1] In a rotary regenerative heat exchanger of the kind having a rotor mounted in a casing, supports are provided for maintaining a certain clearance between the rotor and movable sector plates (6) connected to the casing and located closed to the rotor ends. Each support co-operates through a front surface on a sliding shoe (25) with an end surface (61) on a flange (12) on the rotor. Each support is provided with gas conduit means ending in the gas outlet means in the front surface and being connected to a gas source of a pressure sufficient to establish a gap between the front surface and the end surface (61) so that a cushion of gas is established between the surfaces as the gas escapes from the gas outlet means through the gap. According to the invention a sector plate (6) is provided with only one single gas cushion support located in the region of the symmetry line (69) of the plate (6), and at the outer corners of the plate (6) axially directed stabilizing projections (68) are provided, which face the end surface (61) of the flange (12). These supports (68) prevent tilting of the plate (6) as only one single gas cushion support is provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9624813 A1 19960815; DE 69611520 D1 20010215; DE 69611520 T2 20010823; DK 0807238 T3 20010423; EP 0807238 A1 19971119; EP 0807238 B1 20010110; PL 180424 B1 20010228; PL 321713 A1 19971222; SE 504008 C2 19961014; SE 9500477 D0 19950210; SE 9500477 L 19960811

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040209

2004-09-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611520

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000418

1999-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB AIR PREHEATER, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970811

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE