Global Patent Index - EP 0807367 B1

EP 0807367 B1 2000-04-26 - HEATING ELEMENT WITH A DIFFUSING PLATE, AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING SAME

Title (en)

HEATING ELEMENT WITH A DIFFUSING PLATE, AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING SAME

Title (de)

HEIZELEMENT MIT STREUSCHEIBE UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAUEN DER BEIDEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT CHAUFFANT AVEC PLAQUE DIFFUSANTE ET PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE DUDIT ENSEMBLE

Publication

EP 0807367 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96902320 A

Priority

  • FR 9600167 W
  • FR 9501347 A
  • FR 9501348 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9624233A1] A method for assembling an electrical heating assembly including at least one diffusing plate (1) and at least one heating element (4) arranged in contact therewith. The heating elements (4) are arranged in contact with the diffusing plate (1) and the assembly is subjected to hot heading. The resulting electrical heating assembly produced according to the method is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/68; H05B 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/50 (2006.01); H05B 3/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/50 (2013.01); H05B 3/688 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9624233 A1 19960808; AU 4667696 A 19960821; BR 9607163 A 19971111; CN 1172574 A 19980204; DE 69607939 D1 20000531; DE 69607939 T2 20001109; EP 0807367 A1 19971119; EP 0807367 B1 20000426; ES 2147916 T3 20001001; GR 3033778 T3 20001031; JP H10513303 A 19981215; MX 9705805 A 19980731

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040202

2005-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-02-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-12-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-08-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SEB

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147916 T3

2000-07-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MAROSCIA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607939 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2000-04-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970718

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT