Global Patent Index - EP 0807390 B1

EP 0807390 B1 2000-11-02 - Mechanism for a sofa-bed enabling the adjustment in three positions

Title (en)

Mechanism for a sofa-bed enabling the adjustment in three positions

Title (de)

Sofabettmechanismus, welche die Verstellung in drei Stellungen gestattet

Title (fr)

Mécanisme pour canapé-lit permettant le réglage en trois positions

Publication

EP 0807390 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97107379 A

Priority

IT BA960025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807390A2] Mechanism for a sofa-bed enabling the adjustment in three positions comprising padding elements supported by two frames; said frames can reciprocally move by means of two angle-bars, concurrent in a point; one of said angle-bars 1 supports the frame forming the seat of the sofa-bed and the second one 2 supports the frame forming the back of the sofa-bed; moreover comprising a kinematism which supports said second angle-bar. The mechanism is characterised in that the angle-bars, without interposition of additional elements, constitute a release mechanism enabling the three positions; having the first angle-bar 1 a shaped profile 4, connected to a pawl 7 at two different points 4' and 4'', and having the second angle-bar a toothed profile 3 enabling a cam 9, fixed to said first angle-bar 1, to engage said toothed profile 3; in this way, the relative position among the two angle-bars is well determined both for "divan" and "relax". <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/175; A47C 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/1756 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807390 A2 19971119; EP 0807390 A3 19990609; EP 0807390 B1 20001102; AT 197232 T 20001115; DE 69703409 D1 20001207; DE 69703409 T2 20010621; DK 0807390 T3 20010226; ES 2152591 T3 20010201; IT 1287018 B1 19980724; IT BA960025 A1 19971113

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100506

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100505

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100505

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101102

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100505

2011-01-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRUPPO INDUSTRIALE STYLING S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-11 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

2004-08-11 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SEDAC-MECOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-02-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152591 T3

2001-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703409 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197232 T 20001115

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000207

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB

1999-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 47C 17/175 A, 6A 47C 17/16 B

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB