Global Patent Index - EP 0807500 B1

EP 0807500 B1 2000-07-19 - Chipping machine for chips

Title (en)

Chipping machine for chips

Title (de)

Zerspaner für Hackschnitzel

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteuse pour coupeaux de bois

Publication

EP 0807500 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104843 A

Priority

DE 19619345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807500A2] The cutter comprises a rotor which has a ring of axially parallel vanes. Sets of blades are distributed around the periphery of a ring. Each set comprises a blade-holder (1) and a clamping plate (3) between which a blade (2) is clamped. The holder, blade and clamping plate are tightened by clamping screws. Each blade has elongated holes through which the clamping screws pass and which enables the blades to be radially adjusted for grinding. Each clamping plate has reinforcement ridges (3.1) at least on its part near the blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/005 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 9307371 U1 19940113 - MAIER ZERKLEINERUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807500 A2 19971119; EP 0807500 A3 19980923; EP 0807500 B1 20000719; AT 194792 T 20000815; DE 19619345 A1 19971120

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150321

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 194792 T

- Effective date: 20150321

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140410

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR SE

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194792 T 20000815

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990224

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980916

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR SE

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR SE