Global patent index - EP 0807515 A3

EP 0807515 A3 2000-06-21 - Method for making a waterproof, water vapour permeable clothing

Title (en)

Method for making a waterproof, water vapour permeable clothing

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wasserdichten wasserdampfdurchlässigen Kleidungsstücks

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un vêtement étanche, perméable à la vapeur d'eau

Publication

EP 0807515 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97106317 A

Priority

  • DE 19616472 A
  • DE 19653301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807515A2] A process is for manufacturing an intermediate layer for a water-tight garment which is permeable by steam. It involves the production of a laminate which contains a water-tight function layer that is permeable by steam, and a flat textile structure that reinforces the function layer, which is impregnated with an adhesive agent before it is joined to the function layer to produce the laminate. Preferably the laminate consists of a membrane, e.g. Sympatex (R), laminated with a polyamide charmeuse.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 5/24; A41D 31/00; B32B 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A41D 31/02 (2006.01); A41H 43/04 (2006.01); B32B 7/08 (2006.01); C09J 5/00 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01); D06H 5/00 (2006.01); D06M 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/593 (2013.01); A41D 31/02 (2013.01); B32B 7/08 (2013.01); D04H 1/52 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807515 A2 19971119; EP 0807515 A3 20000621; EP 0807515 B1 20020116; JP H10121312 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59705984

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-01-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 32B 5/28 A, 7B 32B 5/24 B, 7A 41D 31/00 B

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYMPATEX TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 32B 5/24 A, 7A 41D 31/00 B, 7B 32B 5/28 B

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT