Global Patent Index - EP 0807572 B1

EP 0807572 B1 2001-12-12 - Device for destroying drifting mines

Title (en)

Device for destroying drifting mines

Title (de)

Gerät zum Vernichten von Treibminen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la destruction de mines à la dérive

Publication

EP 0807572 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107618 A

Priority

DE 19619571 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807572A2] The device uses a shell (1) which is dropped into the water (3) and which is stabilised so that it adopts a vertical position, with a search head (22) for a floating mine pointing upwards at the top of the shell. When a floating mine is detected by the search head a drive motor (21) and a steering device (27) is activated via a control, for directing the shell towards the mine for destruction of the latter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63G 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63G 7/02 (2013.01); F42B 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807572 A2 19971119; EP 0807572 A3 19990519; EP 0807572 B1 20011212; DE 19619571 A1 19971120; DE 19619571 B4 20040422; ES 2169829 T3 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050510

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050509

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2004-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040507

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040507

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169829 T3

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705728 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001221

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1998-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE