Global patent index - EP 0807585 B1

EP 0807585 B1 2000-01-05 - TAMPER-PROOF AND UNREFILLABLE CLOSURE WITH OVERTOP

Title (en)

TAMPER-PROOF AND UNREFILLABLE CLOSURE WITH OVERTOP

Title (de)

ORIGINALITÄTSVERSCHLUSS FÜR FLASCHEN

Title (fr)

FERMETURE INVIOLABLE DU TYPE ANTI-REREMPLISSABLE AVEC ELEMENT RAPPORTE DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0807585 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96903267 A

Priority

  • MX 9600001 W
  • MX 9500727 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9623704A1] A stopper for bottles of the tamper-proof and non-refillable type which includes an overtop (A), a screwtop (B) of the tamper-proof type, a pourer (C), a valve (D), a valve seat or gasket (E) and a cylindrical tube (F) characterized in that the lower part of the screwtop has a ring (20) with a series of angled teeth (19) that allow it to be turned when being screwed on and prevent it from being turned when being unscrewed. The ring (20) is joined to the body of the top by means of a series of horizontal ribs or bridges which break when the ring is unable to turn when the top is unscrewed for the first time. This ring (20) has two vertical cuts with a separation of 180 degrees that cause the ring to separate into two pieces when the horizontal ribs or bridges are broken. The cylindrical body of the top has a smaller diameter than the ring and is designed in such a way that it can receive an overtop having the same diameter as the ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 49/04; B65D 41/34; B65D 51/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/34 (2006.01); B65D 49/04 (2006.01); B65D 50/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/3409 (2013.01); B65D 49/04 (2013.01); B65D 50/041 (2013.01); B65D 51/18 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0084 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9623704 A1 19960808; CO 4480049 A1 19970709; EP 0807585 A1 19971119; EP 0807585 B1 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-07-14 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20040220

2003-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GUALA CLOSURES S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20001003

2001-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2000-11-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GUALA CLOSURES S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-06-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-04-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT PT

2000-01-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980220

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970901

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT PT