Global patent index - EP 0807600 B1

EP 0807600 B1 2000-01-12 - Ultra-high purity nitrogen trifluoride production method, and unit therefor

Title (en)

Ultra-high purity nitrogen trifluoride production method, and unit therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von hochreinem Stickstofftrifluorid

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production de trifluorure d'azote ultra-pure

Publication

EP 0807600 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97401058 A

Priority

JP 11889896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807600A1] A method capable of continuously producing nitrogen trifluoride of ultra-high purity and a unit therefor are provided. An ultra-high purity nitrogen trifluoride production method comprises: pressurizing a nitrogen trifluoride feed gas, eliminating moisture and carbon dioxide from said feed gas, and cooling down the same feed gas; causing the cooled feed gas to pass through adsorption columns (T1, T2), and introducing it into a medium-pressure rectification column (K1) by way of a reboiler (E2) in said medium-pressure rectification column, where it is rectified in said medium-pressure rectification column; introducing the resulting gas obtained by this rectification into a middle stage of a low-pressure rectification column (K2), where it is rectified; and taking out ultra-high purity nitrogen trifluoride obtained by virtue of this rectification from the lower part of said low-pressure rectification column. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 21/083; F25J 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 21/083 (2006.01); F25J 3/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01B 21/0832 (2013.01); Y10S 62/918 (2013.01); Y10S 62/928 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807600 A1 19971119; EP 0807600 B1 20000112; DE 69701106 D1 20000217; DE 69701106 T2 20000824; JP 3532345 B2 20040531; JP H09303955 A 19971128; US 5832746 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status

2008-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000531

- Year of fee payment: 04

2005-05-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-05-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030411

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020423

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-04-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020417

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-04-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020415

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2000-07-07 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69701106

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1998-12-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE JAPAN, LTD.

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970517

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL