Global Patent Index - EP 0807698 B1

EP 0807698 B1 2002-11-06 - Process and apparatus for the preparation of fibrets from cellulose derivatives

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the preparation of fibrets from cellulose derivatives

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Fibrets aus Zellulosederivaten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la préparation d'une structure fibrillaire à base de dérivés de cellulose

Publication

EP 0807698 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106492 A

Priority

DE 19616010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807698A2] A process for the preparation of microfibres - comprises adding a dope containing a cellulose derivative (eg. cellulose ether or ester) and solvent for this derivative to a precipitating agent and then subjecting the suspension to shear conditions in order to precipitate the dope and form the microfibres, after which the solvent and precipitating are both separated from the microfibres. The suspension formed from the dope and precipitating agent is alternately accelerated and braked at least once as it passes through the shear field. Also claimed is the equipment used in this process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/40; D01D 5/18; D01F 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/40 (2006.01); D01F 2/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/40 (2013.01); D01D 5/18 (2013.01); D01F 2/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19616010 A1 19971106; DE 19616010 C2 19980709; AU 1907897 A 19971030; AU 757068 B2 20030130; EP 0807698 A2 19971119; EP 0807698 A3 19980408; EP 0807698 B1 20021106; US 5868973 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030418

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030418

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708645 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEITZSCHENK FILTERSYSTEMS GMBH

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980430

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI