Global Patent Index - EP 0807721 B1

EP 0807721 B1 2002-12-11 - Drainage fitting for shower trays, bath tubs, cellars, balconies, terraces or the like

Title (en)

Drainage fitting for shower trays, bath tubs, cellars, balconies, terraces or the like

Title (de)

Ablaufarmatur für Dusch- und Badewannen für Keller, Balkone, Terrassen o. dgl.

Title (fr)

Bouche d'écoulement pour cuvettes de douche ou de baignoires, caves, balcons, terrasses, etc.

Publication

EP 0807721 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106760 A

Priority

DE 19619942 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807721A2] The fitting comprises a housing (1) with a sealing ring (9) and a submersed pipe (20) forming part of a siphon trap and projecting into a housing section with an overflow. This housing section is formed by a siphon trap cup (23) which is fitted into the housing and locked in an operating position by the submersed pipe. After removal of the pipe, the cup is movable within the housing interior. Part of the outer surfaces of the pipe are adapted to some of the inner surfaces of the siphon trap cut, during insertion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/22; E03C 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/22 (2006.01); E03C 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/22 (2013.01); E03C 1/28 (2013.01); E03F 5/0408 (2013.01); E03F 5/041 (2013.01); E03F 2005/0418 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807721 A2 19971119; EP 0807721 A3 19980527; EP 0807721 B1 20021211; AT 229599 T 20021215; DE 19619942 A1 19971120; DK 0807721 T3 20030331; ES 2184918 T3 20030416; PT 807721 E 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: VIEGA TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20171013

2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170425

2017-08-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170706 AND 20170715

2017-07-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170423

2017-07-12 [REG NL HC] CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)

- Owner name: VIEGA GMBH & CO. KG; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGE OF OWNER(S) NAME; FORMER OWNER NAME: FRANZ VIEGENER II GMBH & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20170412

2017-07-12 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: VIEGA TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: VIEGA GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20170412

2017-05-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170423

2017-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-01 [REG DK EUP] EP PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170424

2017-04-26 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170423

2017-04-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708922

2017-03-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VIEGA TECHNOLOGY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VIEGA GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160424

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 229599 T

- Effective date: 20160424

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101025

2010-11-03 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101025

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANZ *VIEGENER II G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VIEGA GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: FRANZ VIEGENER II GMBH & CO. KG.#ENNESTER WEG 9#57439 ATTENDORN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VIEGA GMBH & CO. KG#ENNESTER WEG 9#57439 ATTENDORN (DE)

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184918 T3

2003-03-31 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708922 20030123

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229599 T 20021215

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANZ VIEGENER II GMBH & CO. KG.

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001201

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980522

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT