Global Patent Index - EP 0807734 B1

EP 0807734 B1 2001-04-18 - Car door lock

Title (en)

Car door lock

Title (de)

Autotürschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure pour une portière de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0807734 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401070 A

Priority

DE 19619958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807734A2] The lock has a pivoted bolt (6) co-operating with a staple (6) formed in the bodywork. The electric motor (9) is geared (10) to a rotary disc (11) with two crankpins (13,14) which pivot the catch (8) into its unlocked position. The levers (15,17) connect the disc to the catch. The disc continues to rotate until the crankpins pass over the end (23) of one lever (15) and are disengaged from the device (18) driving the catch, which is returned to its locked position by a spring (21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32; E05B 47/00; E05B 47/06; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807734 A2 19971119; EP 0807734 A3 19990120; EP 0807734 B1 20010418; BR 9704848 A 20000801; BR 9706869 A 20030527; DE 19619958 A1 19971120; DE 19619958 C2 19991021; EP 0812972 A2 19971217; EP 0812972 A3 19990303; EP 0812972 B1 20030409; ES 2157053 T3 20010801; ES 2196273 T3 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110515

2013-04-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130405

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110514

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110514

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110514

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704587

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704587

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157053 T3

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704587 20010523

2001-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO GMBH & CO SCHLIESSSYSTEME KG

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT