Global Patent Index - EP 0807737 B1

EP 0807737 B1 2001-05-16 - Door checks for vehicles

Title (en)

Door checks for vehicles

Title (de)

Türfeststeller für Kraftwagentüren

Title (fr)

Arrêt de porte pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0807737 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97303260 A

Priority

GB 9610046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807737A2] A door check for vehicles in which a link (20) in the form of a strap is adapted to be pivotally connected at one end (21) to a door frame and is adapted to be withdrawn through a housing (1), mounted on a complementary part of the door against a restraining force applied to the strap by the frictional co-operation with the strap of a restraining mechanism housed within the housing, and providing a mounting for a pair of rollers (9,7) which are resiliently urged into engagement with opposite faces of the link (20) and which provide a restraining force to the link (20). The link (20) is so profiled that the resistance to movement of the link (20) through the rollers (9.7) varies during the length of its travel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/22; B60J 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/22 (2006.01); E05C 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807737 A2 19971119; EP 0807737 A3 19980107; EP 0807737 B1 20010516; DE 69704809 D1 20010621; DE 69704809 T2 20010830; ES 2156341 T3 20010616; GB 2313153 A 19971119; GB 2313153 B 20000223; GB 9610046 D0 19960717; GB 9709588 D0 19970702; JP H1046897 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050513

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-05-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704809 20010621

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156341 T3

2001-05-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: D AGOSTINI GROUP

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991124

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980704

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE