Global Patent Index - EP 0807924 B1

EP 0807924 B1 2002-12-11 - Sound or ultrasound transducer

Title (en)

Sound or ultrasound transducer

Title (de)

Schall- oder Ultraschallsensor

Title (fr)

Transducteur à son ou ultrason

Publication

EP 0807924 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105884 A

Priority

DE 19620133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807924A2] The sensor has a radiation element (3) with a planar front surface (34) and a transducer element (1) for oscillation of the front surface at a given stimulation frequency, so that the enture front surface is deflected in phase with the same deflection amplitude. The front surface has a number of concentric ribs (32) with concentric gaps (33) between them, with a metal disc (5) attached to the ribs so that the parts between the ribs act as a membrane segments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 13/00; B06B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/06 (2006.01); G10K 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/0618 (2013.01); G10K 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807924 A2 19971119; EP 0807924 A3 19990602; EP 0807924 B1 20021211; CA 2203583 A1 19971118; CA 2203583 C 20000208; DE 19620133 A1 19971127; DE 19620133 C2 20010913; DE 59708924 D1 20030123; HU 216670 B 19990830; HU 9700904 A2 19980428; HU 9700904 A3 19981228; HU 9700904 D0 19970728; US 5726952 A 19980310

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708924

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120410

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708924 20030123

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDRESS + HAUSER GMBH + CO.KG.

1999-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6G 10K 13/00 A, 6B 06B 1/06 B

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980328

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB