Global patent index - EP 0807993 A3

EP 0807993 A3 2000-01-05 - Contact unit for an electric connector

Title (en)

Contact unit for an electric connector

Title (de)

Kontaktbauteil für einen elektrischen Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Elément de contact pour connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0807993 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97106308 A

Priority

DE 29607136 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807993A2] The contact element (1) has at least two conductor wire connection elements (2,21), one of which is provided by a base part (B) and a cooperating overlying spring part (6), between which the conductor wire is clamped. The base part and the spring part are formed in one piece, which is folded over, with one or both elements having an indent (11) for locating the conductor wire.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29607136 U1 19970821; EP 0807993 A2 19971119; EP 0807993 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060119

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO CONNECTIONTECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO KG

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTRO-TERMINAL GMBH & CO. KG

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE