Global Patent Index - EP 0807995 B1

EP 0807995 B1 2001-12-05 - Device for connecting a coaxial cable to a printed circuit board

Title (en)

Device for connecting a coaxial cable to a printed circuit board

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Verbinden eines Koaxialkabels mit einer gedruckten Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour raccorder un câble coaxial à une carte de circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 0807995 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401072 A

Priority

  • FR 9606150 A
  • US 85496197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0807995A1] The connection device for connecting the coaxial cable (4) to the circuit board (3) has a body (1) which has a connection face (17) and a cavity for the end of the cable, and is immobilised with this face against the board by a fixture (2). Two contact pieces are formed on the body, one in contact with the cable core and the other with the braid. The fixture has at each corner a foot (29) entering into a hole (31) in the board. Each sidewall is slotted (24,25) on both sides of a window (26) accepting a protrusion (28) of substantially triangular cross-section on the side of the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01R 12/714 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0807995 A1 19971119; EP 0807995 B1 20011205; DE 807995 T1 19980430; FR 2748862 A1 19971121; FR 2748862 B1 19980717; JP H1074549 A 19980317; US 5842873 A 19981201

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070514

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060514

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060515

2006-05-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060514

2005-05-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050502

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050426

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708747 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A COAXIAL CABLE TO A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000529

1998-04-30 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980113

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL SE