Global Patent Index - EP 0808235 B1

EP 0808235 B1 2000-07-12 - VARIABLE DIAMETER CUTTER ROLLER OR GLUE SPREADING ROLLER

Title (en)

VARIABLE DIAMETER CUTTER ROLLER OR GLUE SPREADING ROLLER

Title (de)

IN IHREM DURCHMESSER VERÄNDERBARE MESSER- ODER LEIMAUFTRAGSWALZE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU PORTE-LAMES OU APPLICATEUR DE COLLE A DIAMETRE VARIABLE

Publication

EP 0808235 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96902946 A

Priority

  • DE 19504162 A
  • EP 9600372 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19504162A1] A variable diameter cutter roller (20) has a cutter that extends in a parallel direction to the roller axis, approximately in the radial direction in relation to a diametric plane of the roller (53, 53'). The cutter is secured to a support (52, 52') that can be radially adjusted outwards and inwards. In order to adjust the cutter roller (20) easily and quickly to various formats, the support (52, 52') is connected in an articulated manner to the joint that interconnects the two crossbars (41, 42, 41', 42') of a pair of crossbars or to the arm of one of the crossbars that extends beyond one of the joints (47, 48, 47', 48'). In each of the pairs of crossbars, one inner joint of a crossbar is firmly secured to the shaft (30) of the cutter roller and the other inner joint of the other crossbar is mounted on or in the shaft (30) of the cutter roller in an adjustable manner in the axial direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/36 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B26F 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B26D 7/2614 (2013.01); B26D 2210/11 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4708 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4795 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9399 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9406 (2015.04); Y10T 156/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19504162 A1 19960814; DE 19504162 C2 19970220; AT 194539 T 20000715; BR 9607742 A 19980623; CN 1085578 C 20020529; CN 1179744 A 19980422; CZ 9702289 A3 19980218; EP 0808235 A2 19971126; EP 0808235 B1 20000712; ES 2150102 T3 20001116; IN 186327 B 20010811; JP 4090074 B2 20080528; JP H10513406 A 19981222; KR 100423167 B1 20040623; TW 369476 B 19990911; US 6105479 A 20000822; WO 9624471 A2 19960815; WO 9624471 A3 19961024

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-05-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160509

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 194539 T

- Effective date: 20160130

2016-02-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160129

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150102 T3

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194539 T 20000715

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990224

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970717

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT