Global Patent Index - EP 0808286 B1

EP 0808286 B1 2000-01-12 - BAG FOR CONTAINING FLOWABLE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR DISCHARGING FLOWABLE MATERIAL FROM THE BAG

Title (en)

BAG FOR CONTAINING FLOWABLE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR DISCHARGING FLOWABLE MATERIAL FROM THE BAG

Title (de)

SACK ZUM AUFBEWAHREN VON FLIESSFÄHIGEM MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTLEEREN DES SACKES

Title (fr)

SAC POUR MATERIAU FLUIDE ET PROCEDE POUR VIDER LE SAC

Publication

EP 0808286 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96902353 A

Priority

  • GB 9600313 W
  • GB 9503848 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2298185A] A plastics bag 11 for containing a flowable material includes an outlet port 10 and means to restrict the movement of at least a portion of a wall of the bag during discharge of the contents. This prevents the bag from blocking the outlet port during discharge. The means may comprise an annular plastics reinforcing member 14 which is welded to the plastics material of the bag. Alternatively, or in addition, a discharge device 15 which co-operates with the port 13 may be provided, including an end plate 16 and holes 15d for the passage of flowable material into the device. The reinforcing member 14 restricts the bag from collapsing inwardly and the arrangement of the end plate 16 and holes 15d restricting the wall opposite the outlet port from being sucked into the device during discharge of flowable material. As a result, it is found that a high percentage of the volume of liquid in the bag can be discharged therefrom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/06; B65D 88/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/38 (2006.01); B65D 88/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/1668 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

GB 2298185 A8 19980604; GB 2298185 A 19960828; GB 2298185 B 19990707; GB 9603101 D0 19960410; AU 4669796 A 19960918; DE 69606164 D1 20000217; DE 69606164 T2 20000824; EP 0808286 A1 19971126; EP 0808286 B1 20000112; GB 9503848 D0 19950419; WO 9626868 A2 19960906; WO 9626868 A3 19961121; ZA 9601324 B 19960827

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606164 20000217

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980205

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970917

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR