Global Patent Index - EP 0808444 B1

EP 0808444 B1 2001-04-25 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DRYING A HUMID LAYER WITH THE AID OF MICROWAVES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DRYING A HUMID LAYER WITH THE AID OF MICROWAVES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TROCKNUNG EINER FEUCHTEN SCHICHT UNTER EINSATZ VON MIKROWELLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR SECHER UNE COUCHE HUMIDE A L'AIDE D'HYPERFREQUENCES

Publication

EP 0808444 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96903316 A

Priority

  • SE 9600189 W
  • SE 9500546 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9625638A1] A method and an apparatus are adapted to dry, with the aid of microwaves (5), a humid layer (10) which is applied on a nonmetallic carrier (8). In order to be irradiated with microwaves, at least part of the carrier (8) is intended to be introduced between a microwave-emitting means (4) and a microwave-absorbing means (6) in a restricted compartment (2), the microwave-absorbing means (6) having a greater capacity to absorb microwaves than do, when taken together, the carrier part intended to be introduced into the compartment (2) and the humid layer (10) applied on this carrier part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/347; B05D 3/06; H05B 6/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/347 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 15/18 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/80 (2013.01); F26B 3/347 (2013.01); F26B 13/10 (2013.01); F26B 15/18 (2013.01); H05B 2206/046 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

"Trocknungstechnik", K. Kröll, second volume, Springer-Verlag, Heidelberg, 1978, page 418

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9625638 A1 19960822; AT 200820 T 20010515; AU 4736296 A 19960904; DE 69612608 D1 20010531; DE 69612608 T2 20020529; DK 0808444 T3 20010813; EP 0808444 A1 19971126; EP 0808444 B1 20010425; ES 2159018 T3 20010916; SE 502928 C2 19960226; SE 9500546 D0 19950215; SE 9500546 L 19960226

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140215

2015-04-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140215

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612608

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612608

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2007-10-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-10-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/38 PAGES: 263, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159018 T3

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-07-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612608 20010531

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200820 T 20010515

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990415

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970915

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE