Global patent index - EP 0808591 A3

EP 0808591 A3 2000-02-23 - Foldable mattress

Title (en)

Foldable mattress

Title (de)

Faltmatte

Title (fr)

Matelas pliable

Publication

EP 0808591 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97108414 A

Priority

DE 19621169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808591A2] The mat has several folding strips (2-4) running across the length direction of the mat to form folding hinges. At least one of the strips is broken by a slit (9,10) in the area of the longitudinal axis of the mat. The slit extends on each side starting from the strip in a curve into one of the flat areas (6,7). The mat has a recess (11,12) in the area of the slit, which forms a carrying handle (13) with the slit when the mat is folded up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/00; A47C 9/10; A47C 27/14; A63C 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/00 (2006.01); A47C 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/64 (2013.01); A47C 27/001 (2013.01); A47C 27/14 (2013.01); A47C 27/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808591 A2 19971126; EP 0808591 A3 20000223; DE 19621169 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020418

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 27/00 A, 7A 47C 27/14 B, 7A 63C 19/04 B, 7A 47C 9/10 B

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI MC NL PT SE