Global Patent Index - EP 0808693 B1

EP 0808693 B1 2001-12-05 - Method and apparatus for dressing the CBN or diamond ring layer of a grinding wheel

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for dressing the CBN or diamond ring layer of a grinding wheel

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten eines ringförmigen CBN. oder Diamantbelags von Schleifscheiben

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil, pour dresser la partie de CBN ou diamant d'une meule

Publication

EP 0808693 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102464 A

Priority

DE 19620972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808693A1] The method involves using a tool grinding disc (16,18), esp. with an SiC coating, where the tool grinding disc is pressed against the workpiece disc (10) at a first speed, then the tool grinding disc is operated at reduced speed until the coating is round or flat. The body sound of the workpiece disc spindle is measured with one or more ultrasonic sensors (34,36) and analysed. The movement of the tool disc against the workpiece disc is performed automatically and at a defined speed until contact is made. A lower speed is used after contact is detected by one or both ultrasonic sensors and the grinding process is terminated when at least one sensor detects roundness or flatness over one workpiece disc rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 53/08; B24B 49/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 49/18 (2006.01); B24B 53/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 49/18 (2013.01); B24B 53/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808693 A1 19971126; EP 0808693 B1 20011205; AT 210002 T 20011215; DE 19620972 A1 19971127; DK 0808693 T3 20020304; US 5885132 A 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100216

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100215

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100215

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100215

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100215

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-10-04 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-02-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040215

2003-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-03-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705615 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210002 T 20011215

2001-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN WINTER DIAMANTWERKZEUGE GMBH & CO. KG

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971122

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI SE