Global Patent Index - EP 0808714 B1

EP 0808714 B1 2000-08-16 - Apparatus for axially positioning of a printing plate

Title (en)

Apparatus for axially positioning of a printing plate

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum axialen Positionieren einer Druckplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de positionnement axial d'une plaque d'impression

Publication

EP 0808714 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107854 A

Priority

DE 19620997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808714A2] The plate (84) is positioned in the axial direction as it is fitted onto the cylinder (1) of a rotary printing press by a transporting mechanism (28,29). The desired position for the plate is first selected from several alongside each other in the axial direction on the cylinder. The position in the axial direction of the plate in relation to a datum position is then determined, after which the plate is delivered into the previously-selected desired position. The initial position of the plate can be determined, after which it is transported into the datum position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/00; B41F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01); B41F 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/005 (2013.01); B41P 2227/11 (2013.01); B41P 2227/30 (2013.01); B41P 2227/41 (2013.01); Y10S 101/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808714 A2 19971126; EP 0808714 A3 19980304; EP 0808714 B1 20000816; DE 19620997 A1 19971127; DE 19620997 C2 19980326; JP H1044374 A 19980217; US 5806431 A 19980915

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050514

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-07 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010607

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010521

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010518

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010425

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702179 20000921

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-09-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR AXIALLY POSITIONING OF A PRINTING PLATE

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990218

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980826

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE