Global Patent Index - EP 0808717 B1

EP 0808717 B1 2001-12-05 - Interlocking connector assembly

Title (en)

Interlocking connector assembly

Title (de)

Verriegelungssteckeranordnung

Title (fr)

Assemblage de connecteur avec verrouillage

Publication

EP 0808717 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97303108 A

Priority

US 65056996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808717A2] The connector assembly includes an outlet assembly on an ink supply container and an inlet assembly mounted to a printer station. The outlet and inlet assemblies have an outlet and inlet valve respectively. The outlet and inlet valves are simultaneously rotatable into open positions to allow ink flow from the supply container to an ink delivery tube on the station. The outlet and inlet assemblies also have a hook and a latch, respectively, that engage when the outlet and inlet valves are coupled and are in the open position, thereby preventing the outlet assembly from being uncoupled from the inlet assembly when either the outlet or inlet valve is in the open position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175; F16L 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17523 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808717 A2 19971126; EP 0808717 A3 19980708; EP 0808717 B1 20011205; CA 2191636 A1 19971121; DE 69708749 D1 20020117; DE 69708749 T2 20020523; ES 2164302 T3 20020216; JP H1044462 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070507

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060508

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060507

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060507

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050504

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164302 T3

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708749 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991109

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981126

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT