Global Patent Index - EP 0808738 B1

EP 0808738 B1 2003-06-11 - SAFETY MECHANISM FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE

Title (en)

SAFETY MECHANISM FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSMECHANISMUS FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE SECURITE POUR UN VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0808738 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96930424 A

Priority

  • JP 9602659 W
  • JP 23887595 A
  • JP 182096 A
  • JP 183196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5931245A] PCT No. PCT/JP96/02659 Sec. 371 Date May 15, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date May 15, 1997 PCT Filed Sep. 17, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/10967 PCT Pub. Date Mar. 27, 1997A battery control system for an electric vehicle 1 which includes a propelling motor (7) and an electric power unit(10)for driving the motor comprises a plurality of discrete batteries (13a) to (13d) connected in series and outputting a predetermined motor voltage, a plurality of selection switches (25a) to (25h) which are provided corresponding in number to the discrete batteries(13a)to (13d) and selectively connect one of the discrete batteries (13a) to (13d) in parallel to a control circuit (16), a judging device (23) which determines a state of electric energy possessed by each of the discrete batteries (13a) to (13d) and a control device (23) which selects one of the discrete batteries(13a) to (13h) having a maximum energy based on the state of electric energy as determined by the judging device and activates one of the corresponding selection switches (25a) to (25h) accordingly, and a control stabilization circuit (24) provided between the selection switches (25a) to (25h) and the control circuit (16) to thereby supply a stable power to the control circuit from the selected battery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60L 11/18; B60L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60L 3/00 (2006.01); B60L 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62K 11/10 (2013.01); B60L 3/00 (2013.01); B60L 11/1818 (2013.01); B60L 11/1853 (2013.01); B60L 11/1862 (2013.01); B60L 11/1866 (2013.01); B60L 11/1877 (2013.01); B62H 1/04 (2013.01); H02G 11/02 (2013.01); B60L 2200/12 (2013.01); B60L 2210/10 (2013.01); B60L 2230/12 (2013.01); B60L 2250/10 (2013.01); B62K 2202/00 (2013.01); B62K 2204/00 (2013.01); B62K 2208/00 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7005 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7044 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7061 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7088 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7216 (2013.01); Y02T 90/121 (2013.01); Y02T 90/127 (2013.01); Y02T 90/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5931245 A 19990803; CN 1049391 C 20000216; CN 1167464 A 19971210; DE 69628637 D1 20030717; DE 69628637 T2 20040429; EP 0808738 A1 19971126; EP 0808738 A4 19981118; EP 0808738 B1 20030611; JP 3729862 B2 20051221; TW 404362 U 20000901; WO 9710967 A1 19970327

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160916

2016-10-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160916

2016-09-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69628637

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-06-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-05-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100408 AND 20100414

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628637 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010115

1998-11-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT