Global Patent Index - EP 0808765 B1

EP 0808765 B1 2000-03-22 - Covering part made of plastic material for an end region of a vehicle, particularly a passenger car

Title (en)

Covering part made of plastic material for an end region of a vehicle, particularly a passenger car

Title (de)

Verkleidungsteil aus nachgiebigem Werkstoff für einen Endbereich eines Fahrzeuges, insbesondere Personenkraftwagens

Title (fr)

Elément de carrosserie en matière plastique pour une section terminale d'un véhicule, notamment d'une voiture particulière

Publication

EP 0808765 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106331 A

Priority

DE 19620404 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19620404C1] On each longitudinal side of the vehicle (1) adjacent to the wheel housing a plastic holder (17) is fixed on the bodywork side, which simultaneously fixes the upper edge area and the lower edge area (19) of the longitudinally direction section (6) of the covering part. The holder also forms a part wheel housing shell (20). It may be made of thermoplastic by means of an injection moulding process. The holder and the part wheel housing shell can be of a one-piece construction. The holder may be fitted to a rear-side covering part and the part wheel housing shell extends into a rear, lower end area of the wheel housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62D 25/08; B60R 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 19/24 (2006.01); B62D 25/08 (2006.01); B62D 29/04 (2006.01); B60R 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 19/24 (2013.01); B62D 25/08 (2013.01); B62D 29/048 (2013.01); B60R 2019/1886 (2013.01); B60R 2019/247 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49964 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19620404 C1 19970814; EP 0808765 A1 19971126; EP 0808765 B1 20000322; JP H1044889 A 19980217; KR 100416890 B1 20040417; US 6003933 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050417

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2005-04-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2004-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040414

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701293

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990730

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980409

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT