Global patent index - EP 0808886 B1

EP 0808886 B1 2000-08-23 - LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITIONS AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENTS

Title (en)

LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITIONS AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENTS

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKRISTALLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEELEMENTE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET ELEMENTS D'AFFICHAGE A BASE DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 0808886 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96901953 A

Priority

  • JP 9600257 W
  • JP 4635395 A
  • JP 18493395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9624649A1] Liquid crystal compositions containing at least one compound represented by general formula (1') as a first component and at least one compound represented by any of general formulae (2-1) to (2-5) as a second component, wherein n represents an integer of 1 to 10; X represents H or F; and m represents 1 or 2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 19/46; C09K 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 69/76 (2006.01); C07C 69/773 (2006.01); C07C 69/90 (2006.01); C07C 69/94 (2006.01); C09K 19/20 (2006.01); C09K 19/30 (2006.01); C09K 19/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 69/76 (2013.01); C07C 69/90 (2013.01); C07C 69/94 (2013.01); C09K 19/2007 (2013.01); C09K 19/3001 (2013.01); C09K 19/3068 (2013.01); C09K 19/46 (2013.01); Y10T 428/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9624649 A1 19960815; AT 205469 T 20010915; CN 1073548 C 20011024; CN 1178520 A 19980408; DE 69609948 D1 20000928; DE 69609948 T2 20010118; DE 69615158 D1 20011018; DE 69615158 T2 20020228; EP 0808825 A1 19971126; EP 0808825 A4 19980401; EP 0808825 B1 20010912; EP 0808886 A1 19971126; EP 0808886 A4 19980401; EP 0808886 B1 20000823; JP 3273441 B2 20020408; JP 3294615 B2 20020624; KR 100260670 B1 20000615; KR 100260671 B1 20000701; TW 297047 B 19970201; US 5855814 A 19990105; US 5922243 A 19990713; US 6468606 B1 20021022; WO 9624574 A1 19960815

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-01-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609948

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990818

1998-04-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB