Global Patent Index - EP 0808923 B1

EP 0808923 B1 2002-09-04 - Open-end spinning rotor

Title (en)

Open-end spinning rotor

Title (de)

Offenend-Spinnrotor

Title (fr)

Rotor de filage à bout libre

Publication

EP 0808923 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104252 A

Priority

DE 19621190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808923A1] The coupling (3) between the rotor pot of an open end spinner, and the carrier, is a clip bond which holds part of the rotor pot (11) and part of the carrier (12). At least part of the clip bonding is taken up by an elastic component (2). Preferably the elastic component (2) is damped, and is in a ring round the clip coupling (3) at the carrier (12) which has a slit, or a number of slits, to increase the distortion which can be applied to it. The rotor pot (11) has a ring groove (32) as part of the clip coupling. The carrier (12) has a hub (121) structure to be pressed on a rotor shaft (13). The elastic component (2) is firmly bonded to the hub (121). The carrier (12) is an electrical mounting and drive motor, with a limit stop (4) for the rotor pot formed by the elastic component (2). The rotor pot (11) has a counter surface to work with the limit stop (4). The elastic component (2) is of plastics and pref. an elastomer. At least part of the clip coupling is of an aluminium alloy or is an injection moulded component. The clip coupling (3) gives a shaped fit between the rotor shaft (13) and the carrier (12) round the circumference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808923 A1 19971126; EP 0808923 B1 20020904; CZ 289453 B6 20020116; CZ 9701170 A3 19971217; DE 19621190 A1 19971127; SK 56297 A3 19971210; US 5802838 A 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708104 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990927

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970313

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI