Global Patent Index - EP 0808925 B1

EP 0808925 B1 2002-09-04 - Heald control mechanism

Title (en)

Heald control mechanism

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Litzensteuerung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de lisses

Publication

EP 0808925 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302950 A

Priority

GB 9609425 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808925A1] A heald control mechanism including at least one elongate heald rod (11) movable longitudinally between first and second limits of reciprocal motion (HLL,HUL), a heald rod motive means (30) continuously reciprocating along a path parallel to the longitudinal axis of the heald rod, the heald rod being biased toward the first limit of reciprocal motion so as to reside at a first shed position, the heald rod and motive means including co-operating motive latch means (34,35) which engage when the motive means moves relative to the heald rod along said path in a direction toward the second limit of reciprocal motion (HUL) and which automatically disengage when the motive means moves relative to the heald rod along said path in a direction toward the first limit of reciprocal motion (HLL), motive latch control means (50) located adjacent said first limit of reciprocal motion for causing latching or de-latching of said co-operating motive latch means, the motive latch control means being continuously reciprocated along said path for moving said heald rod from said first limit (HLL) of reciprocal motion to an intermediate limit position (IP) located between said first and second limits of reciprocal motion, and selectively operable static latch means (51) operable on said heald rod for selectively retaining the heald rod at said intermediate position such that when a heald rod is retained at said intermediate position said co-operating motive latch means are able to engage in order to cause said heald rod to be moved by said motive means from said intermediate position towards said second limit of reciprocal motion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 3/00; D03C 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/14 (2006.01); D03C 3/00 (2006.01); D03C 3/24 (2006.01); D03D 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/24 (2013.01); D03C 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808925 A1 19971126; EP 0808925 B1 20020904; CN 1068643 C 20010718; CN 1178266 A 19980408; DE 69715087 D1 20021010; DE 69715087 T2 20030417; GB 9609425 D0 19960710; JP 4091141 B2 20080528; JP H1046450 A 19980217; TW 359696 B 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715087

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BONAS MACHINE CY LTD

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120502

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BONAS MACHINE COMPANY LIMITED

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715087 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000321

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980521

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI