Global Patent Index - EP 0808960 B1

EP 0808960 B1 2000-06-28 - Prefabricated reinforcing cage

Title (en)

Prefabricated reinforcing cage

Title (de)

Vorgefertigter Armierungskorb

Title (fr)

Cage d'armature préfabriquée

Publication

EP 0808960 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810239 A

Priority

CH 128996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808960A1] The cage consists of one or more nets (N1), and joins the reinforcing material in a floor plate (P) to that in a wall (W) under pressure. Parallel cross-bars (1) at regular intervals are joined together at one end by a lengthwise one (4). Midway between adjacent cross-bars are additional ones (2) joined at one end to the lengthwise one. All the cross-bars are bent upwards through 90 degrees along a common line (B1), while only the additional ones are also bent along a second line (B2) into a U-shape. All the first and additional cross-bars (1,2) near the outside of the wall are joined together by an additional lengthwise one (5) parallel and close to the first one. A further lengthwise bar (3) is situated near the first bend line, so that all the lengthwise bars are roughly in a common plane. The first cross-bars can extend beyond the additional ones, their ends being joined together by a lengthwise stiffening bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/0622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808960 A1 19971126; EP 0808960 B1 20000628; AT 194199 T 20000715; DE 59701930 D1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701930

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701930

- Representative's name: MEPAT PATENTANWAELTE, DR. MEHL-MIKUS, GOY, DR., DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2010-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DEBRUNNER KOENIG MANAGEMENT AG

- Free text: DAVUM CONSTRUCTION SA#ROUTE DE BUSSIGNY 29 CASE POSTALE 147#1023 CRISSIER (CH) -TRANSFER TO- DEBRUNNER KOENIG MANAGEMENT AG#HINTERLAUBEN 8#9004 ST. GALLEN (CH)

2005-07-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2005-07-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DAVUM CONSTRUCTION SA

- Free text: ALAIN WALROFF##1113 ST-SAPHORIN-SUR-MORGES (CH) -TRANSFER TO- DAVUM CONSTRUCTION SA#ROUTE DE BUSSIGNY 29 CASE POSTALE 147#1023 CRISSIER (CH)

2005-07-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALAIN WALROFF

- Free text: MATILE, GERARD#RUE ANCIEN COLLEGE#1041 VILLARS LE TERROIR (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ALAIN WALROFF##1113 ST-SAPHORIN-SUR-MORGES (CH)

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MATILE GERARD

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701930 20000803

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194199 T 20000715

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATILE, GERARD

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATILE, GERARD

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980511

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL