Global Patent Index - EP 0809027 A3

EP 0809027 A3 2000-10-18 - Reciprocating piston machine with swash plate mechanism

Title (en)

Reciprocating piston machine with swash plate mechanism

Title (de)

Hubkolbenmaschine mit Taumelscheibengetriebe

Title (fr)

Machine à piston alternatif à entraînement par plateau oscillant

Publication

EP 0809027 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97810247 A

Priority

DE 19616961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0809027A2] The swashplate piston machine may be used in an air-conditioning system for a vehicle, using carbon dioxide as the working fluid. The pistons (2) act via rods onto a non-rotating ring (6) with a pin (14) engaging in a guide (16) which prevents rotation and accommodates tilting of the swashplate assembly. The portion (5) of the swashplate assembly rotating with the hollow drive shaft (4) is connected to it via a linkage (9,11) including a bolt with antifriction elements and has a roller bearing supporting the non-rotating portion. The rotating portion of the swashplate has a pin (23) sliding in slits (24) in the hollow drive shaft and engaging a spring-loaded (20) bearing block (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/26 (2006.01); F04B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1072 (2013.01); F04B 27/1054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19616961 A1 19971106; DE 19616961 C2 20021107; EP 0809027 A2 19971126; EP 0809027 A3 20001018; JP H1037850 A 19980213; US 5782219 A 19980721

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050618

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUDI AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT