Global Patent Index - EP 0809067 B1

EP 0809067 B1 2000-08-30 - Process and installation for reducing by recombustion of nitric oxides in exhaust gases from a primary combustion in a furnace

Title (en)

Process and installation for reducing by recombustion of nitric oxides in exhaust gases from a primary combustion in a furnace

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zum Reduzieren mittels Wiederverbrennung der Stickoxide in Abgasen einer Primärverbrennung in einem Ofen

Title (fr)

Procédé de réduction, par recombustion des oxydes d'azote contenus dans les fumées issues d'une combustion primaire réalisée dans un four, et installation pour sa mise en oeuvre.

Publication

EP 0809067 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400984 A

Priority

FR 9606293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0809067A1] The reduction of oxides of nitrogen contained in furnace smoke is carried out by recombustion of the smoke, using a secondary fuel injected into a recombustion zone in at least two jets at relatively high and relatively low pressure respectively. The low-pressure jet is situated outside and concentrically with the high-pressure jet. The secondary fuel is a gas at a pressure of a few millibars to a few hundred millibars for the low pressure jet, and a few hundred millibars to a few bars to the high-pressure one. The pressure and flow of the gas in the two jets are regulated according to the dimensions of the recombustion zone and the characteristics of the smoke. The recombustion zone is also subjected to acoustic waves at a frequency of below some 32 Hz. The procedure is carried out in a recombustion zone (B) fed with secondary fuel through two coaxial inlets (2,2') equipped with pressure regulators (4,5). One wall of the recombustion zone is equipped with an acoustic wave generator (6) to homogenise the mixture inside the zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 6/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/00 (2006.01); F23C 6/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 6/047 (2013.01); F23C 2201/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0809067 A1 19971126; EP 0809067 B1 20000830; AT 195999 T 20000915; CZ 9701352 A3 19971217; DE 69702950 D1 20001005; DE 69702950 T2 20010329; ES 2152070 T3 20010116; FR 2749066 A1 19971128; FR 2749066 B1 19980821; HU 9700845 A1 20000528; HU 9700845 D0 19970630; PL 320054 A1 19971124; PT 809067 E 20010228; SK 55397 A3 19980114

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170511

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170429

2017-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 195999 T

- Effective date: 20170430

2017-05-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170429

2017-05-03 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170429

2017-04-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69702950

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160401

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160408

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ, FR

- Document: AT 195999 T

- Effective date: 20130328

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAZ DE FRANCE, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69702950

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702950

- Representative's name: RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE LORENZ SEIDLER GOSS, DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702950

- Representative's name: LORENZ SEIDLER GOSSEL RECHTSANWAELTE PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702950

- Representative's name: RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE LORENZ SEIDLER GOSS, DE

2011-06-29 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

2009-08-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ SOCIETE ANONYME; FR

- Effective date: 20090601

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-02-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-03-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-23 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152070 T3

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-12-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702950 20001005

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970529

2000-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195999 T 20000915

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991207

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 970529