Global Patent Index - EP 0809078 A3

EP 0809078 A3 2000-03-08 - Cooking apparatus with forced-draft burner

Title (en)

Cooking apparatus with forced-draft burner

Title (de)

Kochgerät mit Gebläsebrenner

Title (fr)

Appareil de cuisson à brûleur à soufflage

Publication

EP 0809078 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97103503 A

Priority

IT PN960031 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0809078A2] Gas-fuelled apparatus for cooking food, in particular gas-heated oven, comprising a combustion chamber, a flue gas outlet conduit and a cooking cavity, blowing means being arranged so as to be directed towards said combustion chamber, said blowing means being capable of circulating, in a substantially open circuit made up by said combustion chamber and said flue gas outlet conduit, a flow of ambient air, wherein, upon turning on the electric installation of the oven, any possible unburnt fuel gas is permanently evacuated from said combustion chamber. In a preferred manner, the chamber housing the burner is provided with at least an opening communicating with the atmosphere, which is adapted to provide a natural evacuation passage for unburnt combustible gases. The first ignition to the burner occurs after a pre-determined time of ventilation, subsequently to the ignition command delivered by an appropriate control arrangement, and the following ignitions occur immediately after said ignition command. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/12; F24C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/08 (2006.01); F24C 3/12 (2006.01); F23N 5/12 (2006.01); F23N 5/18 (2006.01); F23N 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/128 (2013.01); F24C 3/087 (2013.01); F23N 5/12 (2013.01); F23N 5/20 (2013.01); F23N 2005/182 (2013.01); F23N 2023/22 (2013.01); F23N 2027/04 (2013.01); F23N 2033/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0809078 A2 19971126; EP 0809078 A3 20000308; EP 0809078 B1 20020717; DE 69713956 D1 20020822; DE 69713956 T2 20021107; DK 0809078 T3 20021104; ES 2180834 T3 20030216; IT 1289379 B1 19981002; IT PN960031 A1 19971124; IT PN960031 D0 19960522

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040305

2005-03-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040304

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-03-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180834 T3

2003-02-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69713956 20020822

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX PROFESSIONAL S.P.A.

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL