Global patent index - EP 0809235 A3

EP 0809235 A3 2000-06-28 - Sound-proofing and sound-damping element with protuberances and depressions

Title (en)

Sound-proofing and sound-damping element with protuberances and depressions

Title (de)

Schalldämmendes und - dämpfendes Bauteil mit Erhebungen und Vertiefungen

Title (fr)

Elément absorbant et insonorisant avec protubérances et dépressions

Publication

EP 0809235 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97107998 A

Priority

DE 19620375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0809235A2] A noise insulating and damping component has raised profiled elements and intervening recesses formed in a sheet of closed cell thermoplastic foam. Hollow chambers (8.1, 8.2) formed inside the raised areas are open to the noise source and form vibrating air columns to dampen vibration transmission. Each raised element (1.1, 1.2) consists of sidewalls (6.10, 6.11, 6.20, 6.21) connected to an upper area (4.1, 4.2) and a base area (5.1, 5.2, 5.3) by membranes (7.10, 7.11, 7.20, 7.21) and is separated from the adjacent raised area by a recess (2). The side walls, upper area and base area of each raised element consist of closed cell foam (10) within a skin of solid polymer and the membranes consist of compressed foam. Also claimed is manufacture of the component from a flat sheet of thermoplastic foam, where a strip of mostly closed cell foam is extruded and thermoformed under pressure to create raised elements (1.1, 1.2) and recesses (2), the sidewalls (6.10, 6.11, 6.20, 6.21) of the raised areas being stretched further than the upper (4.1, 4.2) and base (5.1, 5.2, 5.3) areas and the transition regions between the sidewalls and both upper and base areas being compressed to form a membrane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/162

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/162 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0809235 A2 19971126; EP 0809235 A3 20000628; DE 19620375 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20011218

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE