Global Patent Index - EP 0809533 B1

EP 0809533 B1 2000-05-17 - MILLING ROLLER AND MILL FITTED THEREWITH

Title (en)

MILLING ROLLER AND MILL FITTED THEREWITH

Title (de)

ZERKLEINERUNGSWALZE SOWIE ZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINE MIT EINER SOLCHEN WALZE

Title (fr)

CYLINDRE DE BROYEUR ET BROYEUR EQUIPE D'UN TEL CYLINDRE

Publication

EP 0809533 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96904065 A

Priority

  • DE 19506848 A
  • EP 9600588 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19506848A1] A milling roller (24) for a mill has transverse blade recesses (30) in circumferential grooves (28) with a threaded drilling (62) in their bases. Blade bodies (32) to be inserted into the blade recesses (30) have a square section and an assembling drilling (60) along the diagonal of their central surface. A threaded stud (64) extends therethrough and mates with the threaded drilling (62) in the base of the blade recess (30) (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19506848 A1 19960822; AT 192946 T 20000615; EP 0809533 A1 19971203; EP 0809533 B1 20000517; WO 9625231 A1 19960822

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20030202

2003-06-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20030202

2002-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-04-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HOLZMAG AG RECYCLING TECHNOLOGY

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-02-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605250

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB NL SE

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192946

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990122

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970801

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB NL SE