Global Patent Index - EP 0809551 B1

EP 0809551 B1 2000-05-10 - SHEET-METAL BENDING MACHINE WITH LOCKING DEVICE

Title (en)

SHEET-METAL BENDING MACHINE WITH LOCKING DEVICE

Title (de)

BLECHBIEGEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER ARRETIEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PLIER DES TOLES AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE

Publication

EP 0809551 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96901634 A

Priority

  • AT 9600022 W
  • AT 23295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9624444A1] An arresting device is disclosed for a bending punch (7) in the frame (2) of a sheet metal bending device which can slide backwards and forwards in a straight line between two side posts (3, 4). Between the bending punch (7) and side posts (3, 4), efficient holding brakes (23) with retarders (21) on the side posts (3, 4) are provided, as well as brake blocks (24) which can be applied to the retarders (21) and withdrawn again by a drive unit (33, 34, 35) and are attached to the bending punch (7) via articulating rods (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9624444 A1 19960815; AT 192676 T 20000515; DE 59605187 D1 20000615; EP 0809551 A1 19971203; EP 0809551 B1 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605187 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192676 T 20000515

2000-01-05 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SBM SCHOELLER-BLECKMANN MASCHINENBAU GES.M.B.H.

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI