Global Patent Index - EP 0809725 B1

EP 0809725 B1 2000-07-26 - POCKET FOR A KNITTED GARMENT PANEL

Title (en)

POCKET FOR A KNITTED GARMENT PANEL

Title (de)

TASCHE FÜR GESTRICKTES BEKLEIDUNGSTEIL

Title (fr)

POCHE POUR PANNEAU DE VETEMENT TRICOTE

Publication

EP 0809725 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96903310 A

Priority

  • SE 9600181 W
  • SE 9500535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9625541A1] A pocket for a knitted garment panel which is produced by knitting with needles in single or double bed or in a combination thereof. The pocket comprises a pocket opening (12) adjacent a pocket pouch (11) knitted in single bed and an edge arranged in connection with the pocket opening, which edge forms a pocket border and which comprises at least one knitted loop (15) made in single bed in direct connection with the pocket pouch (11). The pocket border also comprises at least one structural knitting (14; 16, 17) running in parallel with the loop (15) and below it at the front of the pocket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/24; D04B 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/20 (2006.01); D04B 1/24 (2006.01); D04B 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9625541 A1 19960822; AT 195007 T 20000815; AU 4735796 A 19960904; AU 696909 B2 19980924; CA 2212362 A1 19960822; CN 1064419 C 20010411; CN 1177991 A 19980401; CZ 9702570 A3 19980218; DE 69609490 D1 20000831; DE 69609490 T2 20010405; DK 0809725 T3 20001218; EP 0809725 A1 19971203; EP 0809725 B1 20000726; FI 973324 A0 19970814; FI 973324 A 19970814; HU 9801374 A2 19980928; JP H11500189 A 19990106; NO 308668 B1 20001009; NO 973734 A 19970813; NO 973734 D0 19970813; PL 178735 B1 20000630; PL 321803 A1 19971222; RU 2176694 C2 20011210; SE 510021 C2 19990412; SE 9500535 D0 19950214; SE 9500535 L 19960815; SK 110697 A3 19980603

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-02-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-10-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609490 20000831

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970822;LV PAYMENT 19970822;SI PAYMENT 19970822

2000-07-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195007 T 20000815

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991116

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1997-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970822;LV PAYMENT 970822;SI PAYMENT 970822