Global Patent Index - EP 0809784 B1

EP 0809784 B1 2001-04-25 - PROXIMITY FUSE WITH PASSIVE UNIT

Title (en)

PROXIMITY FUSE WITH PASSIVE UNIT

Title (de)

ANNÄHERUNGSZÜNDER MIT PASSIVER EINHEIT

Title (fr)

FUSEE DE PROXIMITE A UNITE PASSIVE

Publication

EP 0809784 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95941288 A

Priority

  • SE 9501454 W
  • SE 9404216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9618079A1] A proximity fuse for initiating detonation of the effective part of a robot, comprising a passive unit is described. It includes a first antenna means (1) for receiving electromagnetic radiation within the microwave range, having a relatively narrow first antenna lobe, and a second antenna means (2) for receiving electromagnetic radiation within the microwave range, having a second, relatively broad antenna lobe, that encloses the first antenna lobe, the first and second antenna lobes preferably being rotationally symmetric in the roll direction of the robot. The proximity fuse comprises electronic components and circuits (3-8, 10, 11) for detecting a first signal S1 from the first antenna lobe and a second signal S2 from the second antenna lobe and a first means (9) for issuing a third signal S3 for initiating a detonation of said effective part. It is in particular characterized in that the proximity fuse is arranged to issue the third signal S3 in the case where the following conditions are simultaneously satisfied: a) the quotient Z of the amplitude A1 of the signal S1 and the amplitude A2 of the signal S2 exceeds a first value Z1 determined in advance, i.e. that Z = A1/A2 > Z1, and b) the time derivative dZ/dt exceeds a second value Z2 determined in advance, i.e. dZ/dt > Z2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9618079 A1 19960613; DE 69520800 D1 20010531; DE 69520800 T2 20010823; EP 0809784 A1 19971203; EP 0809784 B1 20010425; NO 313649 B1 20021104; NO 972561 A 19970714; NO 972561 D0 19970605; SE 506114 C2 19971110; SE 9404216 L 19960607

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151203

2015-12-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151203

2015-12-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69520800

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69520800

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2009-02-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-11-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520800

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-31

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAAB DYNAMICS AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990712

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB