Global Patent Index - EP 0809957 B1

EP 0809957 B1 2002-11-20 - Chair, particularly swivel chair, with armrests

Title (en)

Chair, particularly swivel chair, with armrests

Title (de)

Stuhl, insbesondere Drehstuhl, mit Armlehnen

Title (fr)

Chaise, notamment chaise tournante, avec appuis-bras

Publication

EP 0809957 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101798 A

Priority

  • DE 29609607 U
  • DE 29614274 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0809957A2] The arms are each fitted on a vertical support tube (4) to rotate about a vertical axis. The rotary axis (D) of the armrests (9) is eccentric relative to the centre axis (M) of the support tube. The rotary axis can be an axle bolt (6) set in the upper end of the support tube. A sliding body (8) rotatably mounted through the bolt moves in a sliding guide (15) of a support plate (11) of the armrest. The axle bolt can be mounted in a connecting plate (10) fixed on the upper end of the support tube and can be formed by a screw passing through the plate to screw into a socket (7) in the sliding body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/03; A47C 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0809957 A2 19971203; EP 0809957 A3 19991229; EP 0809957 B1 20021120; AT 227951 T 20021215

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRAHL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-12-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060205

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060205

2006-02-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060205

2005-02-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708747 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227951 T 20021215

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020516

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL SE

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL SE