Global Patent Index - EP 0810012 B1

EP 0810012 B1 2000-09-27 - Games cards, especially for the skat game

Title (en)

Games cards, especially for the skat game

Title (de)

Spielkarten, insbesondere eines Skatspiels

Title (fr)

Cartes à jouer, en particulier pour le jeu de skat

Publication

EP 0810012 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107847 A

Priority

DE 29609456 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0810012A1] The rear face of each card is printed with marking fields formed by an arrangement of four vertical columns (V,M,H,S) and four horizontal lines (A-D). The surface of the rear face permits it to be marked using a felt tip pen. The marking centre in each field is circular in a rectangular surround. The surrounds in each column are of a different colour, and each column is associated with the sitting position of an individual player.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/02 (2006.01); A63F 1/04 (2006.01); A63F 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/02 (2013.01); A63F 2001/0491 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0645 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0810012 A1 19971203; EP 0810012 B1 20000927; AT 196612 T 20001015; DE 29609456 U1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BERLINER SPIELE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-06-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-03-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000927

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702392 20001102

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196612 T 20001015

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980529

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI