Global Patent Index - EP 0810036 A3

EP 0810036 A3 2000-12-27 - Closure cap with integrated dispensing pump

Title (en)

Closure cap with integrated dispensing pump

Title (de)

Verschlusskappe mit integrierter Spenderpumpe

Title (fr)

Capuchon de fermeture avec pompe intégrée

Publication

EP 0810036 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97108654 A

Priority

DE 29609625 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0810036A2] The closure cap (1) with integrated pump (2) has a hollow piston rod (6) turnable and movable in a top aperture (5), and a pump housing (10) connected to the cap. The cap is non-turnably fastened to a container. The fastening consists of a positive locking connection, active in direction of turning (1), between cap and container. The cap is oval, and snap-fastened to the container neck. A locking projection (28) on the inside (27) of the cap acts with a complementary locking groove in the container neck.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00; B65D 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3047 (2013.01); B05B 11/3001 (2013.01); B05B 11/306 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0810036 A2 19971203; EP 0810036 A3 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030827

2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

1999-08-04 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19971203

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL