Global patent index - EP 0810043 B1

EP 0810043 B1 2000-08-02 - Roll stand arrangement for single strand rolling

Title (en)

Roll stand arrangement for single strand rolling

Title (de)

Walzgerüstanordnung für einadriges Walzen

Title (fr)

Structure de cage de laminoir pour laminage à ligne unique

Publication

EP 0810043 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107988 A

Priority

DE 19622155 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0810043A1] The rolling stand assembly for single line rolling consists of a row of housings (6, 7). Each of the housings accommodates a pair of roll shafts and their drive. The housings are provided with side flanges, are oriented at an angle relative to the rolling line in an alternating manner, and are mounted on a support structure consisting of a base plate (3) and pairs of vertical support plates (1, 2) with seating surfaces (1a, 2a). Stiffening ribs (5) are positioned between the vertical support plates. The ribs (5) are joined to the base plate (3) and to the side surfaces of the vertical support plates. The stiffening ribs (5) take the form of a symmetrically bent plate whose parallel edges (5a) are joined to the base plate (3) while its angled edges are joined to the side surfaces of the support plates (1, 2). The outer surfaces of the stiffening ribs are distanced from the outer surfaces of the housings (6, 7). The seating surfaces (1a, 2a) lie in a plane which is parallel to the horizontal middle rolling plane. The side flanges of the housings (6, 7) consist of sections (8a, 8b; 9a, 9b) oriented at right angles to one another. The ribs (5) can function as chute surfaces for scale. The cavities bounded by the base plate, the ribs and the vertical support plate can be filled with a solidifying material such as concrete. Such filler material can be reinforced with elements joined to the inner surface of the ribs, the base plate or the vertical support plates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/06; B21B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/18 (2006.01); B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21B 13/00 (2006.01); B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/005 (2013.01); B21B 31/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0810043 A1 19971203; EP 0810043 B1 20000802; AT 195083 T 20000815; CN 1102466 C 20030305; CN 1170639 A 19980121; DE 19622155 A1 19971204; JP H1052704 A 19980224; US 5927128 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070516

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070517

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070516

2008-01-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20020619

2003-01-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-05-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE SPA

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-05-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010507

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010412

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702102

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195083

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990826

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970603

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE