Global Patent Index - EP 0810068 B1

EP 0810068 B1 2000-02-02 - Socket wrench of ratchet type

Title (en)

Socket wrench of ratchet type

Title (de)

Ringschlüssel vom Ratschentyp

Title (fr)

Clef à cliquet du type à bague

Publication

EP 0810068 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108689 A

Priority

  • EP 96108689 A
  • US 65600896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5636557A] A ratchet-type ring spanner includes a handle and a head portion which, in turn, includes a circular peripheral wall defining a receiving compartment therein and including a web area which connects with the handle, a cavity being defined in the web area. A ratchet wheel is received in the compartment and includes a plurality of teeth in an outer periphery thereof and a polygonal inner periphery. An arcuate toothed member is mounted in the cavity and includes a plurality of teeth defined on a first side thereof for engaging with the teeth of the ratchet wheel and a second side bearing against a wall defining the cavity. A stop member is mounted in the cavity and includes a first end thereof bearing against the wall defining the cavity. A spring is mounted between the stop member and the toothed member to bias the toothed member away from the stop member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/462 (2013.01); B25B 13/463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5636557 A 19970610; DE 59604370 D1 20000309; EP 0810068 A1 19971203; EP 0810068 B1 20000202; ES 2144175 T3 20000601

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-09-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160906

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160529

2016-06-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160529

2016-05-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59604370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APEX BRANDS, INC., SPARKS, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59604370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: APEX BRANDS, INC., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150528 AND 20150603

2015-06-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: APEX BRANDS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-06-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-12-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20131201

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120515

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144175

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970114

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE