Global Patent Index - EP 0810311 B1

EP 0810311 B1 2000-11-02 - Loom for the realisation of ornamental fringes

Title (en)

Loom for the realisation of ornamental fringes

Title (de)

Webmaschine zur Herstellung von Zierfransen

Title (fr)

Métier pour la réalisation de franges à tête gansée

Publication

EP 0810311 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97420079 A

Priority

FR 9606962 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0810311A1] The assembly to produce fringes with braided heads has a shaft (30) for the fringe crochet hook (19) which can be disconnected from its drive (32). The end of the shaft, away from the crochet hook (19), has a heel (33a) to follow the run of the fringe formation through the beating faces of limit stops (34a,34b) at a moving unit (35) which sets the crochet hook movement to give the undulations in the fringes as they are produced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 41/00; D03D 5/00; D04D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/00 (2006.01); D04D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04D 5/00 (2013.01); D03D 41/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0810311 A1 19971203; EP 0810311 B1 20001102; DE 69703412 D1 20001207; FR 2749326 A1 19971205; FR 2749326 B1 19980807; US 5829486 A 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040527

2003-05-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SAHUC MICHEL

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703412 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000204

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT