Global Patent Index - EP 0810334 B1

EP 0810334 B1 2000-11-08 - Construction element for heat insulation

Title (en)

Construction element for heat insulation

Title (de)

Bauelement zur Wärmedämmung

Title (fr)

Elément de construction pour isolation thermique

Publication

EP 0810334 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101949 A

Priority

DE 19621643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0810334A1] The insulation body (5) which is to be inserted between the e.g. building and outside part (B) has integrated pressure elements running across the longitudinal extension of the insulation body and attached to both components. These pressure elements are formed as profiled bodies (1) with several vertically aligned pressure webs (2,12). The length of the pressure elements in the direction of the longitudinal extension of the insulation body is a multiple of its vertical height. The dimensions of the pressure webs are different to conform with the stresses which occur in the various load directions. The profiled bodies can each consist of at least three pressure webs. At least some areas of the webs are inclined by a maximum of 45 degrees from the vertical.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/0038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0810334 A1 19971203; EP 0810334 B1 20001108; AT 197484 T 20001111; CA 2204699 A1 19971130; DE 19621643 A1 19971204; US 5822938 A 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702589

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140207

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197484 T

- Effective date: 20140207

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHOCK BAUTEILE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHOCK BAUTEILE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-03-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-01-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-02-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702589 20001214

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR LI LU NL SE

2000-11-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197484 T 20001111

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980112

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR LI LU NL SE