Global Patent Index - EP 0810416 B1

EP 0810416 B1 2002-09-25 - Pyrotechnic delay tube

Title (en)

Pyrotechnic delay tube

Title (de)

Pyrotechnisches Verzögerungsröhrchen

Title (fr)

Tube pour retard pyrotechnique

Publication

EP 0810416 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97108283 A

Priority

DE 29609498 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0810416A2] A pyrotechnic delay tube (3) consists of a mechanically initiated detonator (11) and a delay charge (12) located in a sleeve (10) having side vents (15) for the delay charge gases. The novelty is that the sleeve (10) is closed at the burning direction (50) downstream end and has calibrated side bores (15) in this closed end (13) region. Preferably, the bores (15) lie in a single plane (14), are mutually offset by 60 degrees in a star arrangement, are axially spaced by 0.5-1.5 times the delay charge diameter (22) from the closed bottom end (13) on which the charge (12) rests and have a diameter of 0.3-0.5 times the charge diameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/16; F42C 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29609498 U1 19970925; EP 0810416 A2 19971203; EP 0810416 A3 19990519; EP 0810416 B1 20020925; ES 2184004 T3 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070522

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071204

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2006-07-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184004 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404443

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708296 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT

1998-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT