Global patent index - EP 0810897 B1

EP 0810897 B1 2000-06-21 - FACE MASK

Title (en)

FACE MASK

Title (de)

GESICHTSMASKE

Title (fr)

MASQUE FACIAL

Publication

EP 0810897 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96904412 A

Priority

  • SE 9600216 W
  • SE 9500627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9625982A1] A face mask intended to cover at least the wearer's mouth and nose includes means for holding the mask in a fixed position on the wearer, and further includes a first and a second (1) opening, an inhalation valve fitted in the first opening and connectable to a source of breathing gas, and an exhalation valve (4) fitted in the second opening (1). According to the invention, the mask includes a device (5) which is fitted on the outside of the mask and surrounds the exhalation valve (4). The exhalation valve (4) is mounted in the device (5) such that when the device (5) is in an open position (5') the exhalation valve (4) will be out of contact with the second opening (1), and so that when the device (5) is in a closed position the inhalation valve will be in contact with the second opening (1). The exhalation valve functions as a one-part valve in the closed position of the device (5). The face mask also includes locking means which function to hold the device (5) either in its open or its closed position, and indicating means which can be seen by the wearer of the mask and which indicates whether the device is open or closed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/08 (2006.01); A61M 16/06 (2006.01); A62B 18/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9625982 A1 19960829; AU 4852896 A 19960911; AU 705233 B2 19990520; CA 2213262 A1 19960829; DE 69608952 D1 20000727; DE 69608952 T2 20010201; EP 0810897 A1 19971210; EP 0810897 B1 20000621; JP H11500637 A 19990119; SE 504000 C2 19961014; SE 9500627 D0 19950220; SE 9500627 L 19960821

INPADOC legal status

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100220

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100219

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100219

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTERSPIRO EUROPE AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-03-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTERSPIRO AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-11-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTERSPIRO EUROPE AB U B

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTERSPIRO AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608952

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-27

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990903

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970830

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE