Global patent index - EP 0810916 A4

EP 0810916 A4 2000-08-09 - LATHES

Title (en)

LATHES

Title (de)

DREHMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

TOURS

Publication

EP 0810916 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96902185 A

Priority

  • AU 9600090 W
  • AU PN129195 A
  • AU PN678495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9626051A1] The present invention provides in one aspect a lathe having a bed mounted to be rotatable in a horizontal plane about a vertical axis. The present invention also provides in another aspect a lathe having a head stock comprising a lathe spindle passing through a hollow column and within the hollow column means adapted to connect a vacuum to the interior of the lathe spindle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27C 7/00; B23B 17/00; B23B 19/00; B27C 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 3/06 (2006.01); B23B 31/30 (2006.01); B23Q 1/00 (2006.01); B23Q 1/01 (2006.01); B23Q 1/48 (2006.01); B27C 7/00 (2006.01); B27C 7/02 (2006.01); B27C 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27C 7/02 (2013.01); B23B 3/06 (2013.01); B23B 31/307 (2013.01); B23Q 1/0027 (2013.01); B23Q 1/015 (2013.01); B23Q 1/4809 (2013.01); B27C 7/00 (2013.01); B27C 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9626051 A1 19960829; CA 2213529 A1 19960829; EP 0810916 A1 19971210; EP 0810916 A4 20000809

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040901

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020731

2000-11-29 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RA4

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-11-15 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2000-11-15 [DA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: DA4

2000-08-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 27C 7/00 A, 7B 27C 7/04 B, 7B 23B 17/00 B, 7B 23B 19/00 B

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970828

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE